Honour Board
Professor Dr. Biplob Kumar Biswas
Chairman
02 Feb 2019 - 08 Aug 2020
Engr. Dr. Md. Zakir Hossain
Chairman
07 Aug 2017 - 01 Feb 2019
Dr. Md. Tanvir Hasan
Chairman
18 Jul 2017 - 06 Aug 2017
Professor Dr. Md. Anwar Hossain
Chairman
31 May 2017 - 17 Jul 2017
Dr. Md. Farhad Bulbul
Chairman
24 Aug 2016 - 30 May 2017